skip to content

Khan, Mohammed Asif Hameed

CPSO#: 77119

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Manchester Medical School, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 578-8050
Fax: (519) 578-9955 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 77119 )

Business Address:
Unit 302
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 578-8050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ASIF HAMEED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2020
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 May 2021
Summary:

On May 19, 2021, the Discipline Committee of the College heard, by videoconference, 
an allegation of Dr. Khan’s professional misconduct. Dr. Khan had “co-signed” 
prescriptions which were being filled at pharmacies in British Columbia. Dr. Khan had 
no relationship with the patients for whom the prescriptions were written. Dr. Khan had 
also provided signed blank prescriptions to an acquaintance. An assessor retained by 
the College to review this matter concluded that Dr. Khan failed to meet the standard of 
practice of the profession in his prescribing practices by signing prescriptions provided 
by the pharmacies in British Columbia and also had failed to meet the standard of 
practice of the profession in providing his patient with signed blank letterhead. The 
assessor opined that Dr. Khan had exposed patients to potential harm or injury. 
 
The hearing proceeded in the presence of Dr. Khan and his counsel, and counsel for 
the College. On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the 
Committee found that Dr. Khan committed an act of professional misconduct under: 
   -  paragraph 1(1)2 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
      1991, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his 
      care of patients; and 
   -  paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 
      1991, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
      medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
      regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
       
The College withdrew the remaining allegation against Dr. Khan. 
Disposition 
 
On considering the Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty and joint submission on 
penalty, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   •  Dr. Khan attend before the Committee to be reprimanded 
   •  The Registrar suspend Dr. Khan’s certificate of registration for three months, 
      commencing from June 1, 2021 at 12:01 am 
   •  The Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Khan’s certificate of 
      registration, as set out in the order 
   •  Dr. Khan pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000. 
 
The Committee’s reasons for decision were released to the parties on June 25, 2021, 
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario v. Khan, 2021 ONSCPD 32, and are 
available for review on the College’s website.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 19, 2021