skip to content

Mohamed, Sarab Hameed

CPSO#: 94465

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73624 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sarab Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAB HAMEED MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012