skip to content

Mohamed Ouda, Wagih Ouda Ahmed

CPSO#: 87723

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Oct 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Sep 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 24 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2007