skip to content

Mohamed, Nourhan Safwat

CPSO#: 97815

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
4th Floor
150 Sherway Dr
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416)521-4057
Fax: (416)521-4072 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905)848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905)813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nourhan S. Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mohamed ( CPSO# 97815 )

Business Address:
4th Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4057

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NOURHAN SAFWAT MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017