skip to content

Mohamed, Mohamed Imamdeen

CPSO#: 25230

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Mar 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 101 - 855 Broadview Ave Toronto, ON M4K 1Z1 Tel: 416-466-9908
Instructions: Medical records location as per above, c/o Dr. A. Giannopoulos.
Date Received: 09 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)