skip to content

Mohamed, John Kenneth

CPSO#: 18101

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. A. Aziz 955 Queen Street East Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3
Date Received: 30 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:05 Dec 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015