skip to content

Mohamed Ally, Shamshaad Banu

CPSO#: 87849

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519 464 4400
Fax: 519 464 4400 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Mohamed Ally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mohamed Ally ( CPSO# 87849 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may fax their request to the attention of Ms. Kirstin Kurian at Alpha IT: Fax 416 449 8543 or call 416 449 2100
Date Received: 15 Dec 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAMSHAAD BANU MOHAMED ALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED ALLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008