Mohamed, Ahmed Helmy Abdelhafeez (CPSO#: 96603)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Minya, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 2011 to 10 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013