skip to content

Mohabir, Nadira Nicole

CPSO#: 86304

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WellOne Medical Centre
103-18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone: (647) 748-5663
Fax: (647) 740-7166 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cloud Care Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Canada
Phone: (416) 361-6000
Fax: (416) 361-6044
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nadira Mohabir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mohabir ( CPSO# 86304 )

Business Address:
WellOne Medical Centre
103-18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone Number: (647) 748-5663

Business Address:
55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 361-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADIRA NICOLE MOHABIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHABIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009