skip to content

Moga, Michael-Alice

CPSO#: 89244

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2015
EXPIRY DATE
31 Oct 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mayo Medical School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Dept. of Critical Care Medicine
2nd Floor Atrium, Room 2830
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6860 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Nov 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2018 Active
 1.    Dr. Michael-Alice Moga may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Moga holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Moga  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Moga's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Moga's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 1, 2015. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 31, 2022.