skip to content

Moffat, Bradley Stewart

CPSO#: 95256

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
Room E2-215
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8547
Fax: 519-685-8775 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vogt & Moffat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vogt ( CPSO# 86632 )
Dr. B. Moffat ( CPSO# 95256 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commisiioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
PO Box 5777 Station B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E2 - 215
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8547

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRADLEY STEWART MOFFAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFFAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2018