skip to content

Moeenalsadat, Mahsa

CPSO#: 98541

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Shiraz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3C7P3
Phone: 9054727000 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mahsa Moeenalsadat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moeenalsadat ( CPSO# 98541 )

Business Address:
Rougevalley
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHSA MOEENALSADAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOEENALSADAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016