skip to content

Mobo, Gerson

CPSO#: 97593

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Church Street
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone: 4164631500 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gerson Mobo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mobo ( CPSO# 97593 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 463-1500

Business Address:
491 Church Street
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone Number: 4164631500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GERSON MOBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History