skip to content

Mixa, Kiran

CPSO#: 95193

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Singh, Kirandeep (used until: 04 Feb 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Ave
Urgent Medical Care Clinic
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kiran Mixa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mixa ( CPSO# 95193 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 917-3155


Corporation Name: Neel Chauhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jun 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active
             Dr.  Kirandeep  Singh may practice medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.