skip to content

Mittal, Bharti

CPSO#: 96878

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Baroda University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bracebridge Medical Arts Centre
36 , Mcdonald street
Bracebridge
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C2
Phone: (705) 645-2281
Fax: (705) 645-0057 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bharti Mittal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mittal ( CPSO# 96878 )

Business Address:
36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L C2
Phone Number: 7056452281

Business Address:
Archdekin Medical Clinic
P.O. Box 660
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1T9
Phone Number: (705) 645-2223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BHARTI MITTAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITTAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 29 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 30 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2013