skip to content

Mitoff, Peter

CPSO#: 84686

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Junction Road
Toronto ON  M6R 2K8
Phone: (416) 766-1162
Fax: (416) 766-0463 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Mitoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mitoff ( CPSO# 84686 )

Business Address:
5 Junction Road
Toronto ON  M6N 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 766-1162

Business Address:
96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2K8
Phone Number: (647) 748-4897

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER MITOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2010