skip to content

Mitchell, Sara Berman

CPSO#: 91693

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
A442 - 2075 Bayview Avenue.
Toronto, Ontario
M4N 3M5
York ON  M6C 3X6
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 3448
Fax: 416-480-5354 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sara Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mitchell ( CPSO# 91693 )

Business Address:
Suite A455
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA BERMAN MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2015