skip to content

Mitchell, Michael Andrew

CPSO#: 98055

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd E
E6-202
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519)667-6756
Fax: (519)667-6597 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ernst & Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ernst ( CPSO# 98030 )
Dr. M. Mitchell ( CPSO# 98055 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
E6-316
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
E6-202
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6756

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 14 Nov 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2016