skip to content

Mitchell, Jessica Sara

CPSO#: 87772

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jessica Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 May 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2009 to 21 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018