skip to content

Mitchell, Craig Andrew

CPSO#: 96410

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
307 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone: (613) 354-7486 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Craig Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mitchell ( CPSO# 96410 )

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
307 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone Number: (613) 354-7486

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CRAIG ANDREW MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2014