skip to content

Mistry, Niraj Kumar

CPSO#: 86641

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Medicine
555 University Avenue
Room 7727, 7th Floor Atrium
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8422
Fax: (416) 813-8345 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 15-014
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6060
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital - UHN
Family Health Team
399 Bathurst Street
2nd Floor, West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

7 West, 7th Floor Pediatric Clinic
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 4162817013
Fax: 4162817102
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Niraj Mistry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mistry ( CPSO# 86641 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Suite 2052
Mailbox 392
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 287-8131

Business Address:
Department of Pediatrics
St. Michael's Hospital
014 - 30 Bond Street
15th Floor Cardinal Carter
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Family Health Team
2nd Floor-West Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Room 10213
Black Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIRAJ KUMAR MISTRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISTRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011