skip to content

Misra, Shikha

CPSO#: 100947

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
UCC - Room 11
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIKHA MISRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015