skip to content

Misra, Sabeena

CPSO#: 93685

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Kathmandu University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2464 Howard Ave
Ste 103A
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-4996
Fax: (519) 258-0776 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

WRH, Ouellett campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 3W5
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Department of Medicine (Gastroent)
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metroplitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sabeena Misra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Misra ( CPSO# 93685 )

Business Address:
103A - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-4996

Business Address:
Division of Gastroenterology
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 3W5
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
Department of Medicine (Gastron)
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective:02 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:02 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2012 Active
 Dr.  Sabeena Misra may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine and
            Gastroenterology, only.