skip to content

Miskin, Murray

CPSO#: 19303

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Murray Miskin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Oxford Medical Imaging 55 York Street Toronto ON M5J 1R7 Mississauga Ultrasound 71 King Street West Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016