skip to content

Mishchenko, Natalia

CPSO#: 101080

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Volgogradskij Medicinskij Institut, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1813 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone: (705) 222-9038 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705 523 7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Natalia Mishchenko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mishchenko ( CPSO# 101080)

Business Address:
1813 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone Number: (705) 222-9038

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATALIA MISHCHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHCHENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015