skip to content

Miro, Joaquim

CPSO#: 85624

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHU Sainte Justine
Department of Cardiology
3175 Cote Sainte Catherine
Montreal QC  H3T 1C5
Phone: (514) 345-4931 Ext. 5401
Fax: (514) 345-4896

Additional Practice Location(s)

Institut de Cardiologie
5000 Bélanger Est
Montreal QC  H1T 1C8
Canada
Phone: (514) 376-3330
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Cardiology Effective:02 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOAQUIM MIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2010