skip to content

Mirham, Lorna

CPSO#: 95381

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: Mirham, Lorna Magdi Lamei Khalil (used until: 31 May 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Crt
Brampton ON  L6T 5V1
Phone: 4164869238 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lorna Mirham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Mirham ( CPSO# 95381 )

Business Address:
1115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5V1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORNA MIRHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2016