skip to content

Mireskandari, Kamiar

CPSO#: 89493

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Leeds, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7403
Fax: (416) 813-8266 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mireskandari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mireskandari ( CPSO# 89493 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7403


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:01 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2015 Active
             Dr. Kamiar Mireskandari may practise medicine independently in Ophthalmology.