Mir, Mary Colleen (CPSO#: 98316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: Cordukes, Mary Colleen (used until: 13 Jan 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
99 Fifth Ave
Suite 17
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone: (613) 563-3670
Fax: (613) 563-4124
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Monarch Centre
152 Cleopatra Dr
Suite 108
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Canada
Phone: (613) 627-0795
Fax: (613) 226-7059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Colleen Mir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mir ( CPSO# 98316 )

Business Address:
Unit 19
99 Fifth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5K4
Phone Number: (613) 563-3670

Business Address:
108 - 152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 627-0795

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY COLLEEN MIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014