Mir, Kamran (CPSO#: 99562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Rd
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth St E
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-3120
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Canada
Phone: (519) 343-2030
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L2
Canada
Phone: (519) 323-2210
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

39-2nd Street East
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 363-2340
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamran Mir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mir ( CPSO# 99562 )

Business Address:
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0
Phone Number: (519) 343-2030

Business Address:
39-2nd Street East
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 363-2340

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMRAN MIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2013