skip to content

Mintz, Randall Robert

CPSO#: 87067

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3-940 Mosley St
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 2G9
Phone: 7054294801
Fax: 18449274810 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mintz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mintz ( CPSO# 87067 )
Dr. H. Fraser ( CPSO# 91938 )

Business Address:
3-940 Mosley Street
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 2G9
Phone Number: 7054294801

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RANDALL ROBERT MINTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009