skip to content

Minocher Homji, Ruksheen Sam

CPSO#: 100463

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
unit 3
551 Knights hill road
London ON  N6J 3A1
Phone: (519) 668-0491
Fax: 519-668-1942 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Minocher Homji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Minocher Homji ( CPSO# 100463)

Business Address:
Unit 3
551 Knights Hill Road
London ON  N6J 3A1
Phone Number: (519) 668-0491

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RUKSHEEN SAM MINOCHER HOMJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINOCHER HOMJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015