skip to content

Minhas, Ripudaman Singh

CPSO#: 89333

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital, Pediatrics
Unity Health Toronto
61 Queen Street East, 2nd Floor,
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: 416-867-3655
Fax: 416-867-3736 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R.S. Minhas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Minhas ( CPSO# 89333 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 393-1528

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RIPUDAMAN SINGH MINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINHAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2012