skip to content

Yu, Ming

CPSO#: 93943

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7335 Yonge St.
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone: (905) 707-7309
Fax: (888) 979-6305 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Carlton St.
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
Fax: 416-646-1892
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ming Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yu ( CPSO# 93943 )

Business Address:
Carlton Church Medical
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 707-7309

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MING YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012