skip to content

Milne, John Kenneth

CPSO#: 20435

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 20 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Nov 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 20-Nov-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 20 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1966
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 20 Nov 2018