skip to content

Milne, Gordon William

CPSO#: 27805

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Nov 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 May 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Nov 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: November 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gordon William Milne to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 23, 2016:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Milne's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Milne was required to complete a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program ("SCERP"). Prior to starting the SCERP, Dr. Milne resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On September 22, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required hospitalist physician, Dr. Gordon William Milne, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Milne to:

•Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months
•Attend and successfully complete the medical record-keeping course offered at the University of Toronto
•Provide a written summary of the following policies, guidelines, or tools with reference to how his hospitalist practice will change as a result:
-2016 Hypertension Canada CHEP Guidelines (Annual Update)
-Chronic Kidney Disease in Adults- Assessment and Management (NICE Guideline)
-Chronic Heart Failure Diagnosis and Management
-American Geriatric Society 2015 updated Beers Criteria for inappropriate medication use in older adults
-CPSO Medical Records policy
-CPSO Planning for and Providing End-of-Life Care Policy
-Healthcare Consent Advance Care Planning Ontario Toolkit: Advice and Guidance on Best Practices
•Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately three months following the completion of the Education Plan