skip to content

Milne, Brian

CPSO#: 30252

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Milne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2017