skip to content

Mills, Sian Elizabeth

CPSO#: 97413

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 2015