skip to content

Mills, Jessica Louise Alexandra

CPSO#: 87837

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Oct 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Surgery Effective:28 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2007 to 25 Nov 2007
EL - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 26 Nov 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
EL - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2007