skip to content

Mills, Ann

CPSO#: 95534

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: George, Ann (used until: 05 Jan 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ann Mills Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mills ( CPSO# 95534 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANN MILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

Western University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2016