skip to content

Millette, Honorius Jean Baptiste

CPSO#: 19810

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 17-Nov-2001

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1990