skip to content

Miller, Robert Taylor

CPSO#: 25948

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroqois Falls Family Health Team
58A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone: (705) 258-2818
Fax: (705) 258-2828 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert T. Miller and Dr. Cheri E.H. Bethune Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Miller ( CPSO# 25948 )
Dr. C. Bethune ( CPSO# 50148 )

Business Address:
58A Anson Drive A
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 258-2828

Business Address:
233 8th Street
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 272-4200

Business Address:
507 8th Avenue
Matheson ON  P0K 1N0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT TAYLOR MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2015