skip to content

Miller, Robert Barry

CPSO#: 30297

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 242
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-7874
Fax: (416) 850-1138 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert B. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Miller ( CPSO# 30297 )

Business Address:
Suite 242
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 498-7874

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:10 Sep 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 11 Jun 1978
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 31 Dec 1978
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1979 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Miller’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Miller engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his conduct and communications towards a health care professional. It is also alleged that Dr. Miller engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his conduct and communications towards Patient “A” and a family member of Patient “A” during a medication appointment, and in his consultation note to the physician who referred Patient “A” to Dr. Miller.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: February 20, 2020 Hearing: July 28 - 31, 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2007 Active
             Dr. Robert Barry Miller may practise otolaryngology in an office based setting
            only.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of September 27, 2018, Dr. Robert Barry Miller has completed all elements of his SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)