skip to content

Miller, Philip Yoji

CPSO#: 89646

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Feb 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Japanese

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 28 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
EL - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 05 Oct 2008
EL - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2012