skip to content

Miller, Mark William

CPSO#: 96065

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
126 Mississaga Street East
Orillia ON  L3V 1V7
Phone: 705-558-1700
Fax: 888-498-0060 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: MW Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Miller ( CPSO# 96065 )

Business Address:
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone Number: (705) 418-1100

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 418-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2017