skip to content

Miller, Howard Jay

CPSO#: 91897

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Temple University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7555 Montrose Road , Unit 2
Niagara Falls ON  L2H 2E9
Phone: 289-292-0441
Fax: 289-292-0451 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

221 Glendale Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 2K9
Canada
Phone: 905-687-4252
Fax: 905-687-9338
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Howard J. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:21 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013 Active
 Dr. Howard Jay Miller may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
            only.