skip to content

Miller, Gilbert

CPSO#: 52492

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Promenade Circle 301P
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone: (905) 889-1761 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Miller ( CPSO# 52492 )

Business Address:
Suite 301P
1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 889-1761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GILBERT MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1986
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.