skip to content

Miller, Eli

CPSO#: 98046

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10350 Yonge Street
Suite 002
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9
Phone: 416-479-0892
Fax: 416-479-0003 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eli Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Miller ( CPSO# 98046 )

Business Address:
10350 Yonge Street
Suite 002
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELI MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2015