skip to content

Millar, Heather Christine

CPSO#: 93624

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
3200 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6A 3B2
Phone: (416) 287-8080 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Section of Gynaecology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
7th Floor, Black Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-7654 Ext. 298444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kindercare Pediatrics
491 Eglinton Ave W
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-848-7665
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER CHRISTINE MILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015