skip to content

Milkereit, Maike-Svenja

CPSO#: 95614

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Byward FHT
Suite 300
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Milkereit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Milkereit ( CPSO# 95614 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAIKE-SVENJA MILKEREIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILKEREIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013